Financial history ST MICHAEL'S PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1059388
Charity reporting is overdue by 232 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £64.69k £22.35k £41.47k £38.49k £35.33k
Total expenditure £62.67k £67.34k £55.16k £39.94k £38.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £60.13k N/A N/A £2.61k N/A