WHITECROFT EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1059446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £198.80k £289.52k £443.24k £182.31k £143.72k
Total expenditure £67.13k £69.16k £109.79k £138.39k £101.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A