Accounts and annual returns THE PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS OF HOLMER SCHOOL

Charity number: 1059868
Charity reporting is overdue by 520 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 155 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 155 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 520 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 520 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 November 2020 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required