THE PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS OF HOLMER SCHOOL

Charity number: 1059868
Charity reporting is up to date (153 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £4.73k £6.87k £9.36k £6.16k £12.88k
Total expenditure £6.00k £5.72k £11.27k £8.18k £13.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A