2ND AND 7TH WELWYN GARDEN CITY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1060288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 March 2021 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 July 2019 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 July 2019 528 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 July 2019 893 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required