LLANASA VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1060495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.62k £5.63k £6.88k £6.63k £15.77k
Total expenditure £4.62k £4.71k £9.88k £4.57k £6.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.00k