Financial history BREADLINE

Charity number: 1060661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £191.66k £169.01k £245.83k £236.56k £223.67k
Total expenditure £176.95k £175.15k £189.61k £239.58k £208.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A