Trustees BREADLINE

Charity number: 1060661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Burch Trustee 15 October 2022
CANTO LEARNING LIMITED
Received: On time
Glenn William Tyrone Henry Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Esther Ruth Kenney Trustee 12 October 2019
None on record
Philip John Lanyon Trustee 12 October 2019
None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Kenney Trustee 12 October 2019
None on record
Carol Feben Trustee 10 February 2018
None on record
RACHEL SAMWAYS Trustee 04 February 2017
None on record
IAN HAMES Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KETTERING CHRIST THE KING
Received: On time