Financial history ANGLICAN CHURCH PLANTING INITIATIVES

Charity number: 1060703
Charity reporting is up to date (32 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.56k £10.73k £13.28k £11.05k £14.06k
Total expenditure £11.34k £13.38k £13.44k £11.55k £13.06k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A