ST. JOHN'S SCHOOL AND COLLEGE

Charity number: 1061001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.36m £10.82m £11.38m £11.59m £10.62m
Total expenditure £9.34m £10.26m £11.11m £11.17m £10.12m
Income from government contracts £9.15m £10.62m £11.31m £10.25m £10.47m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £73.10k £136.22k £101.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £75.64k £73.40k £73.10k £136.22k £116.30k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £6.45k £1.58k
Income - Charitable activities £9.29m £10.75m £11.31m £11.44m £10.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £794 £723 £3.55k £5.96k £5.77k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.32m £10.23m £11.08m £11.07m £10.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £27.40k £27.61k £24.80k £103.71k £35.07k
Expenditure - Governance £43.76k £36.05k £27.43k £20.20k £19.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0