RAIS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1061071
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1865 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1865 days
Annual return 31 May 2014 12 July 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2013 28 July 2013 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2012 18 July 2012 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2012 10 October 2012 On time
Annual return 31 May 2011 18 September 2011 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2011 04 October 2011 On time