RAIS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1061071
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2010 31/05/2011 31/05/2012 31/05/2013 31/05/2014
Total gross income £29.18k £71.41k £46.39k £22.24k £20.09k
Total expenditure £26.30k £47.85k £46.49k £56.47k £23.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A