Accounts and annual returns THE RALPH LEVY CHARITABLE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 200009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 05 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 23 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 22 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 February 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 06 February 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window