Financial history HENRY SMITH'S CHARITY

Charity number: 200169
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.00k £3.00k £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k
Total expenditure £3.00k £3.00k £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A