Financial history FEOFFEE OR CHARITY ESTATE

Charity number: 200188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £23.67k £25.33k £24.43k £24.13k £24.53k
Total expenditure £16.62k £17.44k £19.26k £17.21k £16.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A