Accounts and annual returns THOMAS CHRISTIE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 200281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2021 16 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2019 31 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2018 31 December 2019 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2017 27 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2017 Not Required