Accounts and annual returns LORD WHARTON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 200298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required