Financial history LORD WHARTON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 200298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.98k £10.72k £11.20k £10.05k £6.87k
Total expenditure £2.06k £2.62k £14.91k £8.51k £3.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A