Financial history ST ALBANS CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 200330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £14.33k £13.87k £11.14k £5.69k £8.21k
Total expenditure £14.32k £15.21k £11.89k £4.29k £11.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A