WORPLESDON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200382
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 26 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 26 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 16 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 13 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 26 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required