THE MICKLEHAM ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 200410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £32.00k £30.18k £34.49k £35.38k £37.36k
Total expenditure £36.32k £21.70k £29.69k £22.68k £22.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A