RICHMOND CHARITIES

Charity number: 200431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.45m £3.52m £3.91m £4.18m £4.45m
Total expenditure £2.99m £2.92m £2.82m £3.69m £3.80m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £14.40k £10.62k £4.42k £4.40k £4.63k
Income - Other trading activities £2.34m £2.40m £2.43m £2.42m £0
Income - Charitable activities £584.84k £666.11k £934.66k £1.16m £1.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £505.36k £440.80k £533.19k £603.45k £3.23m
Income - Other £0 £13 £259 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £10.00k £6.22k £15 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.35m £1.62m £1.61m £1.92m £2.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.64m £1.31m £1.21m £1.77m £1.56m
Expenditure - Governance £71.30k £75.10k £82.61k £90.42k £33.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £61.41k £49.13k £59.82k £69.82k £70.71k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0