Financial history THE FARRIERS LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 200689
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £657 £12.71k £12.98k £1.05k £2.70k
Total expenditure £657 £13.09k £13.54k £1.05k £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A