Financial history FITZHERBERT AND MOODY CHARITY

Charity number: 201031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.39k £6.36k £6.49k £6.62k £6.76k
Total expenditure £4.68k £10.25k £6.20k £5.00k £5.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A