OLD PARK WARD OLD AGE PENSIONERS FUND

Charity number: 201037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £12.96k £13.21k £12.18k £12.80k £20.24k
Total expenditure £13.20k £21.14k £11.28k £12.02k £12.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £10.00k £10.00k