CHAGFORD PARISH CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD TRUST

Charity number: 201046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET JEFFREYS Trustee 06 February 2012 None on record
TERENCE CHARLES BLEAKMAN Trustee 01 February 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHAGFORD Received: On time
CHAGFORD EDUCATION AND LEISURE TRUST Received: On time
David Jamieson Trustee 19 May 2015 None on record
BARNABY DICKENS Chair 12 June 2012 None on record
TIMOTHY GEORGE GARRATT Trustee 01 January 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHAGFORD Received: On time
BELINDA HAYTER-HAMES Trustee 19 June 2012 None on record