STOKE SAINT MILBOROUGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 201158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.05k £10.53k £11.27k £12.09k £15.17k
Total expenditure £6.18k £9.54k £12.17k £7.83k £6.88k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £11.33k