Financial history WESTON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 201172
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £359 £269 £282 £4.00k £287
Total expenditure £560 £100 £450 £100 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A