Trustees WESTON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 201172
Charity reporting is overdue by 166 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Andrew Garth Tristram Trustee 07 March 2020
FARMER'S CHARITY
Overdue by 166 days
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO
Received: On time
Dr Jordan Kay Savage Trustee 07 March 2020
FARMER'S CHARITY
Overdue by 166 days
David Francis Sheppard Trustee 19 December 2014
FARMER'S CHARITY
Overdue by 166 days
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS, FULBOURN
Received: On time
David McKinley Gant Trustee 02 October 2012
FARMER'S CHARITY
Overdue by 166 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS, FULBOURN
Received: On time
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO
Received: On time
Rev ALICE ABIGAIL GOODMAN Trustee 08 August 2012
THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP
Overdue by 74 days
CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY
Overdue by 74 days
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 74 days
THE ST NICHOLAS GREAT WILBRAHAM TRUST
Received: 66 days late
FARMER'S CHARITY
Overdue by 166 days
ANNE WARD (OR WAAD)
Received: On time
THE JAMES BENSTEAD CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS, FULBOURN
Received: On time
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO
Received: On time
DR Anita Whitehead Trustee 01 April 2012
FARMER'S CHARITY
Overdue by 166 days