Financial history KINGSTON ST MARY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 201214
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022
Total gross income £1.09k £1.53k £1.56k £1.42k £1.69k
Total expenditure £777 £759 £763 £609 £630
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A