Accounts and annual returns ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - HANTS AND SURREY BORDER BRANCH

Charity number: 201291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window