Accounts and annual returns THE HARRIET DAY AND ABRAHAM WATSON TRUST

Charity number: 201317
Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 December 2022 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 December 2021 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 January 2021 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 March 2020 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required