Financial history THE HARRIET DAY AND ABRAHAM WATSON TRUST

Charity number: 201317
Charity reporting is overdue by 174 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.64k £1.68k £1.72k £1.75k £1.78k
Total expenditure £1.60k £1.90k £2.50k £2.00k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A