Financial history THE CAMBRIDGESHIRE SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED

Charity number: 201640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £373.99k £559.83k £454.04k £1.28m £536.32k
Total expenditure £466.88k £459.54k £545.66k £561.83k £568.72k
Income from government contracts £87.00k £87.00k £87.00k £87.00k £87.00k
Income from government grants £1.50k £1.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £308.05k N/A £992.46k £237.35k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £4.11k N/A £3.88k £120
Income - Charitable activities N/A £229.48k N/A £261.93k £287.46k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £18.19k N/A £21.52k £11.38k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £222.63k N/A £2.28k £131.96k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £409.60k N/A £512.91k £525.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £49.94k N/A £48.93k £43.33k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £152.21k N/A £31.34k £141.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £2.19k N/A £1.19k £3.39k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0