TITCHMARSH CLUB ROOM

Charity number: 202080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £86.53k £22.94k £13.92k £13.23k £19.76k
Total expenditure £112.10k £12.36k £9.76k £11.11k £10.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k