Financial history THOMAS PEACHEY'S CHARITY

Charity number: 202480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £8.53k £7.98k £7.90k £7.90k £12.12k
Total expenditure £0 £5.59k £6.29k £14.68k £6.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A