Financial history ELDER STUBBS CHARITY

Charity number: 202497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £58.42k £55.08k £53.87k £54.98k £42.15k
Total expenditure £59.13k £55.29k £50.28k £52.46k £44.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A