THE BAMPTON WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 202735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HELEN RAINEY Trustee 15 June 2019 None on record
DIANA O'BRIEN Trustee 30 November 2011 None on record
JANET GWLADYS NEWMAN Trustee None on record
Ian Macpherson Trustee 19 July 2021 None on record
Rev JANICE COLLIER Trustee 15 July 2019
BAMPTON ASTON ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY Received: On time
BAMPTON EXHIBITION FOUNDATION Received: On time
Wendy Rayner Trustee 03 September 2020 None on record
GILLIAN LONG Trustee 18 April 2012
ASTON AND COTE WOMENS INSTITUTE Received: On time
ALLOTMENTS FOR LABOURING POOR Received: On time
ROSEMARY EDITH PELHAM Trustee
THE J.I. COLVILE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
COLIN REGINALD ROUSE Trustee None on record
GERALD ARTHUR MILLS CSTJ Trustee None on record