ROBERT BARKER OR THE BRIDGE HOUSE TRUST (ESTATE TRUSTEES)

Charity number: 202808
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £62.77k £93.62k £78.01k £78.20k £78.01k
Total expenditure £18.74k £105.90k £107.74k £74.18k £76.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A