Financial history GRENDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 202917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.79k £3.31k £4.90k £1.70k £20.90k
Total expenditure £6.58k £4.72k £4.11k £1.51k £7.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.01k