OXFAM

Charity number: 202918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £414.70m £408.60m £427.20m £434.10m £367.40m
Total expenditure £420.70m £402.60m £438.70m £397.50m £384.60m
Income from government contracts £10.26m £2.37m £5.73m £4.66m £978.26k
Income from government grants £39.90m £37.63m £15.52m £13.85m £8.66m
Income - Donations and legacies £145.50m £135.60m £120.90m £152.40m £102.90m
Income - Other trading activities £86.30m £90.90m £93.90m £92.80m £93.50m
Income - Charitable activities £180.80m £179.80m £209.30m £185.90m £168.50m
Income - Endowments £1.00m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £500.00k £400.00k £300.00k £400.00k £500.00k
Income - Other £1.60m £1.90m £2.80m £2.60m £2.00m
Income - Legacies £17.30m £19.80m £18.00m £54.40m £17.60m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £322.00m £303.50m £336.90m £298.30m £283.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £97.70m £98.10m £100.10m £97.60m £99.60m
Expenditure - Governance £1.40m £1.50m £1.70m £1.40m £1.80m
Expenditure - Grants institution £78.00m £63.10m £89.40m £77.50m £71.22m
Expenditure - Investment management £100.00k £100.00k £200.00k £200.00k £200.00k
Expenditure - Other £1.00m £1.00m £1.70m £1.60m £1.10m