Accounts and annual returns THE CHARITY OF ROBERT HUGO MONTAGU BAKER FOR WOLBOROUGH AND NEWTON

Charity number: 203001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 20 December 2019 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 12 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 18 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required