Financial history SWINDON BLIND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 203090
Charity reporting is overdue by 538 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.85k £7.02k £14.59k £6.74k £5.62k
Total expenditure £7.92k £7.25k £8.83k £8.45k £656
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A