Financial history MARRIOTT'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 203117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £6.28k £6.28k £6.86k £35.91k £7.07k
Total expenditure £974 £2.21k £3.50k £70.32k £3.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A