Financial history THE ANTIENT SOCIETY OF ST STEPHENS RINGERS

Charity number: 203169
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £49.05k £35.84k £34.81k £40.49k £26.81k
Total expenditure £62.44k £5.90k £13.48k £35.12k £308.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A