PORTSMOUTH FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 203323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £29.04k £15.55k £43.11k £21.15k £19.72k
Total expenditure £14.62k £14.66k £15.64k £16.95k £14.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £2.00k £5.50k £10.61k £5.60k