Financial history TIMSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 203475
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £7.19k £16.66k £17.47k £7.43k £9.83k
Total expenditure £13.56k £13.41k £12.85k £13.32k £13.41k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A