DUTTON'S AND ALLEN'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 203546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £31.16k £35.24k £30.61k £13.57k £0
Total expenditure £13.81k £10.88k £18.28k £24.74k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A