Exeter Church Charities

Charity number: 203721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £101.56k £106.03k £111.12k £113.04k £117.04k
Total expenditure £48.36k £68.43k £68.44k £69.85k £48.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A