THE OTTERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 203780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW SHARP Chair None on record
Geoffery Porter Trustee 17 November 2019 None on record
JAMES ARTHUR PYNE Trustee None on record
Tristan Jones Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record
JOAN ELIZABETH SPENCE CULLEN CULLEN Trustee None on record
David Pankhurst Trustee 08 April 2015 None on record
Susan Claire Mills Claire Trustee 18 February 2015 None on record
Catherine Randall Trustee 02 September 2014 None on record
Claire Lister Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record
Sharon Young Trustee 25 January 2017 None on record
EMMA LOUISE COOLING Trustee 26 August 2012 None on record